THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 13:31:51 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: J. J. M. Medical College, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1320-130 King St W
Toronto ON M5X 1C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-777-9355
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aronnilakkara Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Aronnilakkara (CPSO#: 89900 )
Business Address: 1320-130 King St W
Toronto ON M5X 1C8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: J. J. M. Medical College, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1320-130 King St W
Toronto ON M5X 1C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-777-9355
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aronnilakkara Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Aronnilakkara (CPSO#: 89900 )
Business Address: 1320-130 King St W
Toronto ON M5X 1C8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRIYA PRASAD ARONNILAKKARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARONNILAKKARA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRIYA PRASAD ARONNILAKKARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARONNILAKKARA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: J. J. M. Medical College, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2008
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2008