THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 15:14:12 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Government Medical College, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Medical Clinic
6720 Hawthorne Drive
Windsor Ontario N8T 1J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 944-2295
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Medical Clinic
1608 Tecumseh Road West
Windsor Ontario N9B 1T8
Phone: (519) 258-4400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jul 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 29 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H.S. Bhullar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Bhullar (CPSO#: 89901 )
Business Address: Windsor Medical Clinic
1608 Tecumseh Road West
Windsor Ontario N9B 1T8
Business Address: Windsor Medical Clinic
6720 Hawthorne Drive
Windsor Ontario N8T 1J9
(519) 944-2295

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Government Medical College, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Windsor Medical Clinic
6720 Hawthorne Drive
Windsor Ontario N8T 1J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 944-2295
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Medical Clinic
1608 Tecumseh Road West
Windsor Ontario N9B 1T8
Phone: (519) 258-4400
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jul 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 29 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H.S. Bhullar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Bhullar (CPSO#: 89901 )
Business Address: Windsor Medical Clinic
1608 Tecumseh Road West
Windsor Ontario N9B 1T8
Business Address: Windsor Medical Clinic
6720 Hawthorne Drive
Windsor Ontario N8T 1J9
(519) 944-2295

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARBIR SINGH BHULLAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHULLAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARBIR SINGH BHULLAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHULLAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Government Medical College, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 May 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2008