THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:18:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 102-1000 Middlegate Rd
Mississauga ON L4Y 1M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058047000
Fax: 9058042250

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 17 Jul 2009
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Jul 2009
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 17 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 17 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vineeta Ahooja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ahooja (CPSO#: 89907 )
Business Address: 102-1000 Middlegate Rd
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1M3
9058047000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 102-1000 Middlegate Rd
Mississauga ON L4Y 1M3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058047000
Fax: 9058042250

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 17 Jul 2009
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 17 Jul 2009
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 17 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 17 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vineeta Ahooja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ahooja (CPSO#: 89907 )
Business Address: 102-1000 Middlegate Rd
Mississauga Ontario L4Y 1M3
9058047000

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
18 Nov 2010
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 18 2010
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Vineeta Ahooja may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and
cardiology, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Vineeta Ahooja may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and
cardiology, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 18 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Mar 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2008
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2008