THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 03:34:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St Bartholomew's & The Royal London Scho, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Platinum Medical Clinic FHG
3170 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1J 2H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 265-2255
Fax: (416) 265-6737
Address: 1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa Ontario L1H7K4
Phone: 9055763444
Fax: 9055767980

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sithamparanathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sithamparanathan (CPSO#: 89930 )
Business Address: Platinum Medical Clinic FHG
3170 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1J 2H3
(416) 265-2255
Business Address: 2-500 King Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2K9
(905) 576-3444

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: St Bartholomew's & The Royal London Scho, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Platinum Medical Clinic FHG
3170 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1J 2H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 265-2255
Fax: (416) 265-6737
Address: 1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa Ontario L1H7K4
Phone: 9055763444
Fax: 9055767980

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sithamparanathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sithamparanathan (CPSO#: 89930 )
Business Address: Platinum Medical Clinic FHG
3170 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1J 2H3
(416) 265-2255
Business Address: 2-500 King Street West
Oshawa Ontario L1J 2K9
(905) 576-3444

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARTHIKA SITHAMPARANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SITHAMPARANATHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KARTHIKA SITHAMPARANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SITHAMPARANATHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St Bartholomew's & The Royal London Scho, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2008