THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:11:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dow Medical College, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UNIT 1D-1010 Kennedy Circle
Thompson Walk in and Medical Clinic
Milton Ontario L9T 0J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 864-8787
Fax: (905) 864-1522

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jan 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Afroze Salahuddin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Salahuddin (CPSO#: 89931 )
Business Address: 108 - 1224 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5C 4G7
(905) 275-1111
Business Address: 201 Oak Walk Drive
Oakville Ontario L6H 6M3
(905) 257-3297
Business Address: 1D-1010 Kennedy Cir
Thompson medical and walk in clinic
Milton ON L9T 0J9
9058648787

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Dow Medical College, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UNIT 1D-1010 Kennedy Circle
Thompson Walk in and Medical Clinic
Milton Ontario L9T 0J9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 864-8787
Fax: (905) 864-1522

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jan 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 12 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Afroze Salahuddin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Salahuddin (CPSO#: 89931 )
Business Address: 108 - 1224 Dundas Street West
Mississauga Ontario L5C 4G7
(905) 275-1111
Business Address: 201 Oak Walk Drive
Oakville Ontario L6H 6M3
(905) 257-3297
Business Address: 1D-1010 Kennedy Cir
Thompson medical and walk in clinic
Milton ON L9T 0J9
9058648787

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AFROZE SALAHUDDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALAHUDDIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AFROZE SALAHUDDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALAHUDDIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dow Medical College, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2008