THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 04:01:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 2000
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 3
10 John Birchall Road
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 780-2400
Fax: (905) 780-2401

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 21 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sobia Awan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Awan (CPSO#: 89934 )
Business Address: Unit 3
10 John Birchall Road
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 0B2
(905) 780-2400

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Peshawar, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 3
10 John Birchall Road
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 780-2400
Fax: (905) 780-2401

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 21 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sobia Awan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Awan (CPSO#: 89934 )
Business Address: Unit 3
10 John Birchall Road
Richmond Hill Ontario L4S 0B2
(905) 780-2400

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOBIA FAISAL AWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AWAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SOBIA FAISAL AWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AWAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Peshawar, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2008