THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:21:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cebu Institute of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre /
Stronach Regional Cancer Center
Division of Palliative Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: (905) 952-3050
Address: 381 Church Street
Oak Valley Health / The Shakir Rehmatulla Cancer Centre
Palliative Care
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 472-7373
Fax: (905) 472-7046

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Feb 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 25 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arnell Baguio Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Baguio (CPSO#: 89935 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
Stronach Regional Cancer Center
Department of Palliative Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Cebu Institute of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southlake Regional Health Centre /
Stronach Regional Cancer Center
Division of Palliative Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Fax: (905) 952-3050
Address: 381 Church Street
Oak Valley Health / The Shakir Rehmatulla Cancer Centre
Palliative Care
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 472-7373
Fax: (905) 472-7046

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Feb 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 25 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Arnell Baguio Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Baguio (CPSO#: 89935 )
Business Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre
Stronach Regional Cancer Center
Department of Palliative Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 2P9
(905) 895-4521

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARNELL JUMAWID BAGUIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAGUIO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARNELL JUMAWID BAGUIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAGUIO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cebu Institute of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 May 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2008