THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 08:34:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-798-5555
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 Spring St
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 350 John St N
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7 St. Francis Memorial Dr
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1B0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Ring Rd, Iqaluit NU X0A 0H0
Iqaluit Nunavut X0A 0H0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 499 Raglan St N
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 566 Louise St
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Duigenan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Duigenan (CPSO#: 89947 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6

Corporation Name: Carriere Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Carriere (CPSO#: 89329 ) Dr. S. Duigenan (CPSO#: 89947 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K2H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-798-5555
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 75 Spring St
Almonte Ontario K0A 1A0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 350 John St N
Arnprior Ontario K7S 2P6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 7 St. Francis Memorial Dr
Barry's Bay Ontario K0J 1B0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 Ring Rd, Iqaluit NU X0A 0H0
Iqaluit Nunavut X0A 0H0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 499 Raglan St N
Renfrew Ontario K7V 1P6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 566 Louise St
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Duigenan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Duigenan (CPSO#: 89947 )
Business Address: 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6

Corporation Name: Carriere Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Carriere (CPSO#: 89329 ) Dr. S. Duigenan (CPSO#: 89947 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 746-4621

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAUNA DUIGENAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUIGENAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAUNA DUIGENAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUIGENAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Nov 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2008