THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:05:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 203-128 Pine St
Sudbury ON P3C 1X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: W
Fax: 7052226447
Address: 845 Regent Street
Suite 101
Sudbury Ontario P3E 4T3
Phone: (705) 222-6445
Fax: (705) 222-6447

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher C. T. Szeto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Szeto (CPSO#: 89954 )
Business Address: Health Sciences North
Department of Otolaryngology
Head and Neck Surgery
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 222-6445
Business Address: Suite 101
845 Regent Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 4T3
(705) 222-6445
Business Address: 128 Pine St
Suite 203
Sudbury ON P3C 1X3
4168268871

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 203-128 Pine St
Sudbury ON P3C 1X3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: W
Fax: 7052226447
Address: 845 Regent Street
Suite 101
Sudbury Ontario P3E 4T3
Phone: (705) 222-6445
Fax: (705) 222-6447

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher C. T. Szeto Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Feb 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Szeto (CPSO#: 89954 )
Business Address: Health Sciences North
Department of Otolaryngology
Head and Neck Surgery
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury Ontario P3E 5J1
(705) 222-6445
Business Address: Suite 101
845 Regent Street
Sudbury Ontario P3E 4T3
(705) 222-6445
Business Address: 128 Pine St
Suite 203
Sudbury ON P3C 1X3
4168268871

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER CHUNG TEK SZETO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZETO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER CHUNG TEK SZETO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SZETO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Nov 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2008
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2008

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2008