THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:49:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Glen Gate Medical Centre
2385 Burnhamthorpe Rd W
Mississauga Ontario L5L 6A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 607-6661
Fax: (905) 607 5552
Address: C/O Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
(Credit Valley & Summerville FMTUs)
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Farhan M. Asrar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Asrar (CPSO#: 89957 )
Business Address: 2385 Burnhamthorpe Rd W
Mississauga ON L5L 6A4
905-607-6661

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Glen Gate Medical Centre
2385 Burnhamthorpe Rd W
Mississauga Ontario L5L 6A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 607-6661
Fax: (905) 607 5552
Address: C/O Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
(Credit Valley & Summerville FMTUs)
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 19 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Farhan M. Asrar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Asrar (CPSO#: 89957 )
Business Address: 2385 Burnhamthorpe Rd W
Mississauga ON L5L 6A4
905-607-6661

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARHAN MUHAMMAD ASRAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASRAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARHAN MUHAMMAD ASRAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASRAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Institute of Medicine, Pharmacy,Iasi, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jan 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2008