THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:25:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Fax: (905) 494-6614

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Peppin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Peppin (CPSO#: 89979 )
Business Address: 109 Indian Valley Trail
Mississauga ON L5G 2K5
6473342400
Business Address: 520 Loretta Crt
Mississauga ON L5B 3S1

Corporation Name: Andrew Peppin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Fax: (905) 494-6614

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2008
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew Peppin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Nov 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Peppin (CPSO#: 89979 )
Business Address: 109 Indian Valley Trail
Mississauga ON L5G 2K5
6473342400
Business Address: 520 Loretta Crt
Mississauga ON L5B 3S1

Corporation Name: Andrew Peppin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 Jul 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW KEITH HAROLD PEPPIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEPPIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW KEITH HAROLD PEPPIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEPPIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Queen's University, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2008
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2008