THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 06:48:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Hanover Medical School, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of Western Ont
Department of Paediatrics
PO Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8237
Fax: (519) 685-8584
Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Cardiology
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Cardiology
Effective: 21 Oct 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Germany

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Norozi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Norozi (CPSO#: 89981 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Children's Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
PO Box 5010
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, GERMAN
Medical School: Hanover Medical School, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Children's Hospital of Western Ont
Department of Paediatrics
PO Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8237
Fax: (519) 685-8584
Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Cardiology
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatric Cardiology
Effective: 21 Oct 2008
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatric Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Germany

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Norozi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Norozi (CPSO#: 89981 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Children's Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
PO Box 5010
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
26 Feb 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 26 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Kambiz Norozi may practise medicine independently in paediatric cardiology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Kambiz Norozi may practise medicine independently in paediatric cardiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Hanover Medical School, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Nov 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2008