THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 03:58:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: GNGH
5546 PORTAGE RD
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053784647
Extension: 53456
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Oct 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 May 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Farhat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Farhat (CPSO#: 89994 )
Business Address: GNGH
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
(905) 378-4647

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: GNGH
5546 PORTAGE RD
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9053784647
Extension: 53456
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 22 Oct 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 May 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 22 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 26 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Farhat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Farhat (CPSO#: 89994 )
Business Address: GNGH
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
(905) 378-4647

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUSBAH SALEM FARHAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARHAT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MUSBAH SALEM FARHAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FARHAT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2008
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2008