THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:51:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 106
2100 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 3B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 690-3533
Fax: 888-630-9203
Address: Lakeridge health. Ajax
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. M. ABOUNAJA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Abounaja (CPSO#: 89997 )
Business Address: 2100 Ellesmere Road
Suite 106
Toronto Ontario M1H 3C3
416-690-3533

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Abounaja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 May 2021

Corporation Name: Alazhari Abounaja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Jan 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 106
2100 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 3B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 690-3533
Fax: 888-630-9203
Address: Lakeridge health. Ajax
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2006
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. M. ABOUNAJA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Abounaja (CPSO#: 89997 )
Business Address: 2100 Ellesmere Road
Suite 106
Toronto Ontario M1H 3C3
416-690-3533

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Abounaja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 May 2021

Corporation Name: Alazhari Abounaja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Jan 2018

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
18 Mar 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 18 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from March 18, 2025, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mohamed Asadig Abounaja in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Abounaja to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)
of
DR. MOHAMED ASADIG ABOUNAJA
(“Dr. Abounaja”)
to
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)


A. PREAMBLE
1. In this Undertaking:
“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;
“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;
“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

2. I, Dr. Abounaja, certificate of registration number 89997, am a member of the College.
3. I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that I entered into an undertaking dated March 6, 2023 (“the March 2023 undertaking”), in which I agreed to a restriction that required me to dictate a complete patient encounter note contemporaneously after each patient encounter in the emergency room and to undergo remediation and a reassessment of my practice.
4. I, Dr. Abounaja, further acknowledge that I have completed the remediation and reassessment under the March 2023 undertaking, and that this Undertaking replaces and supersedes the March 2023 undertaking.

B. UNDERTAKING
5. I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.
6. Restriction
a. I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to dictate a complete patient encounter note contemporaneously after each patient encounter in the emergency room.
b. I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that if the College determines that the results of the Reassessment of my practice described in section (7)(a) are positive, and the College is satisfied that I have remained in compliance with the restriction in section (6)(a), the College will release me from this Undertaking and will remove both this Undertaking and the summary described in section (15)(b) from the Public Register.
7. Reassessment of Practice
a. I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake that, approximately twelve (12) months after the date I sign this Undertaking, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice (“the Reassessment”) by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the “Assessor” or “Assessors”), for the purpose of assessing my medical recordkeeping. I acknowledge that the Reassessment will include a chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, and may include direct observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
b. I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking.
c. I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.
8. Monitoring
a. I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.
b. I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
c. I, Dr. Abounaja, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
d. I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “A”.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
9. I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
10. I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.
11. I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
12. I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).
13. I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal.
14. I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.
15. Public Register
a. I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
b. I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
Dr. Abounaja must dictate a complete patient encounter note contemporaneously after each patient encounter in the emergency room.

D. CONSENT
16. I, Dr. Abounaja, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to all Assessors:
a. any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;
b. any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and
c. any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
17. I, Dr. Abounaja, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
18. I, Dr. Abounaja, give my irrevocable consent to all Chiefs of Staff and Assessors to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:
a. any information relevant to this Undertaking;
b. any information relevant to the Reassessment;
c. any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
As from March 18, 2025, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Mohamed Asadig Abounaja in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Abounaja to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(“Undertaking”)
of
DR. MOHAMED ASADIG ABOUNAJA
(“Dr. Abounaja”)
to
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the “College”)


A. PREAMBLE
1. In this Undertaking:
“Code” means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
“Discipline Tribunal” means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;
“OHIP” means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
“Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal” means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;
“Public Register” means the College’s register that is available to the public.

2. I, Dr. Abounaja, certificate of registration number 89997, am a member of the College.
3. I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that I entered into an undertaking dated March 6, 2023 (“the March 2023 undertaking”), in which I agreed to a restriction that required me to dictate a complete patient encounter note contemporaneously after each patient encounter in the emergency room and to undergo remediation and a reassessment of my practice.
4. I, Dr. Abounaja, further acknowledge that I have completed the remediation and reassessment under the March 2023 undertaking, and that this Undertaking replaces and supersedes the March 2023 undertaking.

B. UNDERTAKING
5. I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.
6. Restriction
a. I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to dictate a complete patient encounter note contemporaneously after each patient encounter in the emergency room.
b. I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that if the College determines that the results of the Reassessment of my practice described in section (7)(a) are positive, and the College is satisfied that I have remained in compliance with the restriction in section (6)(a), the College will release me from this Undertaking and will remove both this Undertaking and the summary described in section (15)(b) from the Public Register.
7. Reassessment of Practice
a. I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake that, approximately twelve (12) months after the date I sign this Undertaking, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice (“the Reassessment”) by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the “Assessor” or “Assessors”), for the purpose of assessing my medical recordkeeping. I acknowledge that the Reassessment will include a chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, and may include direct observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.
b. I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking.
c. I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.
8. Monitoring
a. I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practice, delegate, or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Out-of-Hospital Premises and Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my “Practice Location” or “Practice Locations”), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.
b. I, Dr. Abounaja, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
c. I, Dr. Abounaja, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
d. I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix “A”.

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
9. I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
10. I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.
11. I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
12. I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location (“Chief of Staff” or “Chiefs of Staff”).
13. I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal.
14. I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.
15. Public Register
a. I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
b. I, Dr. Abounaja, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
Dr. Abounaja must dictate a complete patient encounter note contemporaneously after each patient encounter in the emergency room.

D. CONSENT
16. I, Dr. Abounaja, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to all Assessors:
a. any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;
b. any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and
c. any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
17. I, Dr. Abounaja, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
18. I, Dr. Abounaja, give my irrevocable consent to all Chiefs of Staff and Assessors to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:
a. any information relevant to this Undertaking;
b. any information relevant to the Reassessment;
c. any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (4)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 18 Mar 2025
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mohamed Asadig Abounaja to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 18, 2025.
 
Dr. Abounaja must dictate a complete patient encounter note contemporaneously after each patient encounter in the emergency room. 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 20 Dec 2023
Summary:

Caution-in-Person: 

 

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015. 

 

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:



Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 15 Feb 2018
Summary:
Effective January 16, 2020, Dr. Abounaja has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On March 31, 2023, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Oshawa, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Mohamed Abounaja in respect of an incident that took place in June 2011.

On May 15, 2023, we were advised that the finding is being appealed by Dr. Abounaja.
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (4)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 18 Mar 2025
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mohamed Asadig Abounaja to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 18, 2025.
 
Dr. Abounaja must dictate a complete patient encounter note contemporaneously after each patient encounter in the emergency room. 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 20 Dec 2023
Summary:

Caution-in-Person: 

 

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015. 

 

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person:



Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 15 Feb 2018
Summary:
Effective January 16, 2020, Dr. Abounaja has completed all elements of this SCERP.

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On March 31, 2023, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Oshawa, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Mohamed Abounaja in respect of an incident that took place in June 2011.

On May 15, 2023, we were advised that the finding is being appealed by Dr. Abounaja.
 

Training

Medical School: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicine, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 18 Mar 2025
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 06 Mar 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 13 Apr 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 14 Aug 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 15 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 15 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 31 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 19 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 14 Nov 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 06 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 13 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 14 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2008