THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:40:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Kerala, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAYALAM

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Northern Ontario School of Medicine
Thunder Bay Regional HSC
Department of Critical Care Medicin
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Extension: 6366
Fax: (807) 684-5864

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 02 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip George Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. P. George (CPSO#: 90003 )
Business Address: 157 Whitewater Pl
Rosslyn ON P7K 0A8
807-285-8799
Business Address: 980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
807-684-6366

Corporation Name: Philip George Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Apr 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MALAYALAM
Medical School: University of Kerala, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Northern Ontario School of Medicine
Thunder Bay Regional HSC
Department of Critical Care Medicin
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Extension: 6366
Fax: (807) 684-5864

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 02 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Philip George Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. P. George (CPSO#: 90003 )
Business Address: 157 Whitewater Pl
Rosslyn ON P7K 0A8
807-285-8799
Business Address: 980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
807-684-6366

Corporation Name: Philip George Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Apr 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIP GEORGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEORGE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PHILIP GEORGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEORGE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Kerala, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Feb 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2008