THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:52:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Jaffna, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: King Edward Health Centre
280 King Edward Ave
London Ontario N5Z 3V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 4511363
Fax: 519 451 9395

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Shu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Shu (CPSO#: 90005 )
Business Address: 280 King Edward Ave.
London Ontario N5Z 3V3
(519) 451-1363

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SINHALESE, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Jaffna, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: King Edward Health Centre
280 King Edward Ave
London Ontario N5Z 3V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 4511363
Fax: 519 451 9395

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Shu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Shu (CPSO#: 90005 )
Business Address: 280 King Edward Ave.
London Ontario N5Z 3V3
(519) 451-1363

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISHANTHY SHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KRISHANTHY SHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Jaffna, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2008