THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:25:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National Medical University, 1981
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Tayfour Campus
Physical Med and Rehab
1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 257-5184
Fax: (519) 257-5137

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 05 Mar 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 05 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Delaware

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yuri Marchuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Marchuk (CPSO#: 90047 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Tayfour Campus
Department of physical Med and Rehab
1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
(519) 257-5184

Corporation Name: Naaman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, RUSSIAN, UKRAINIAN
Medical School: National Medical University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Tayfour Campus
Physical Med and Rehab
1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 257-5184
Fax: (519) 257-5137

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 05 Mar 2012
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 05 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Delaware

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Yuri Marchuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Marchuk (CPSO#: 90047 )
Business Address: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Tayfour Campus
Department of physical Med and Rehab
1453 Prince Road
Windsor Ontario N9C 3Z4
(519) 257-5184

Corporation Name: Naaman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 May 2020

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
14 Dec 2012
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 14 2012
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Yuri Marchuk may practise medicine independently in physical medicine and
rehabilitation, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Yuri Marchuk may practise medicine independently in physical medicine and
rehabilitation, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National Medical University, 1981

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 14 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Aug 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2008
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2012

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2010

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2008
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Nov 2008