THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:15:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University Hassan II - Ain Chok, 2001
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1439 Youville Drive. Unit 17B
Orléans Ontario K1C 4M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-824-4848
Fax: 613-824-9876

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jul 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 29 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Imane Bidari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Bidari (CPSO#: 90074 )
Business Address: 17B - 1439 Youville Drive
Orléans Ontario K1C 4M8
(613) 824-4848

Corporation Name: Dr. I. Bidari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Oct 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: University Hassan II - Ain Chok, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1439 Youville Drive. Unit 17B
Orléans Ontario K1C 4M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-824-4848
Fax: 613-824-9876

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jul 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 29 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Imane Bidari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Bidari (CPSO#: 90074 )
Business Address: 17B - 1439 Youville Drive
Orléans Ontario K1C 4M8
(613) 824-4848

Corporation Name: Dr. I. Bidari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Oct 2016

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IMANE BIDARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIDARI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IMANE BIDARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIDARI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University Hassan II - Ain Chok, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2008
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2008