THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:48:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Ottawa
Department of Anesthesiology TOH
501 Smyth RD
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 71887
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Talab Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Talab (CPSO#: 90112 )
Business Address: Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Suite CCW1402
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 71887

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: University of Ottawa
Department of Anesthesiology TOH
501 Smyth RD
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Extension: 71887
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Brockville General Hospital Brockville
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health
LOCATION: Oshawa

HOSPITAL: Brockville General Hospital
LOCATION: Brockville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Talab Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Oct 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Talab (CPSO#: 90112 )
Business Address: Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Suite CCW1402
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 737-8899 Extn: 71887

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HESHAM FATHY ALI TALAB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALAB is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HESHAM FATHY ALI TALAB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TALAB is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2009