THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:51:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Baroda University, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, SWAHILI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3840 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9E 3N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-972-3944
Fax: 519-969-4478

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N.R. Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Patel (CPSO#: 90130 )
Business Address: 3840 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9E 3N9
519-972-3944

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, SWAHILI
Medical School: Baroda University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3840 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9E 3N9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-972-3944
Fax: 519-969-4478

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N.R. Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Patel (CPSO#: 90130 )
Business Address: 3840 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9E 3N9
519-972-3944

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
03 May 2013
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 03 2013
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon


As from May 3, 2013, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Naresh Raghunath
Patel, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Patel to the
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Naresh Raghunath Patel may not engage in the practice of hyperbaric
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon


As from May 3, 2013, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Naresh Raghunath
Patel, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Patel to the
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Naresh Raghunath Patel may not engage in the practice of hyperbaric
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Baroda University, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 May 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 May 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 03 May 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jan 2009