THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:02:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 206
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 289-0185
Fax: (416) 289-0187

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Usha Ramanathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Ramanathan (CPSO#: 90189 )
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 438-2911
Business Address: 3276 St. Clair Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1L 1W1
(416) 285-3666
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit 206
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 289-0185
Fax: (416) 289-0187

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Providence Health Care Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Providence Health Care Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Usha Ramanathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Ramanathan (CPSO#: 90189 )
Business Address: 3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough Ontario M1W 3W3
(416) 438-2911
Business Address: 3276 St. Clair Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1L 1W1
(416) 285-3666
Business Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2V5
(416) 438-2911

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. USHA RAMANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMANATHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. USHA RAMANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAMANATHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Feb 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Mar 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2009