THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:47:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5377
Fax: (416) 864-5378
Address: Cardio 1 Medical Clinic
230 Osborne St #2A, Winnipeg, MB R3
Winniipeg Manitoba R3A 1R9
Phone: (204) 287-5222
Fax: (204) 287-5223

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 24 May 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vosoughi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Vosoughi (CPSO#: 90201 )
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5050

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PERSIAN
Medical School: Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 864-5377
Fax: (416) 864-5378
Address: Cardio 1 Medical Clinic
230 Osborne St #2A, Winnipeg, MB R3
Winniipeg Manitoba R3A 1R9
Phone: (204) 287-5222
Fax: (204) 287-5223

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 24 May 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 24 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vosoughi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Vosoughi (CPSO#: 90201 )
Business Address: 30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
(416) 864-5050

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REZA VOSOUGHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOSOUGHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REZA VOSOUGHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VOSOUGHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Apr 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2010

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Apr 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Feb 2009