THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:22:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: U ESTADUAL PAULISTA-BOTUCATU SAO PAOLO, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 627 Carlaw Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 3K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6472168687
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 14 Sep 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andre Amaral Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Amaral (CPSO#: 90217 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Critical Care Medicine
Room B5 02
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100 Extn: 83666

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: U ESTADUAL PAULISTA-BOTUCATU SAO PAOLO, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 627 Carlaw Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4K 3K5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6472168687
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 14 Sep 2017
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andre Amaral Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Amaral (CPSO#: 90217 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Critical Care Medicine
Room B5 02
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-6100 Extn: 83666

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
14 Sep 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 14 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Andre Carlos Kajdacsy-Balla Amaral may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Critical Care Medicine, University of Toronto, in which
Dr. Amaral holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Amaral no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Andre Carlos Kajdacsy-Balla Amaral may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
Division of Critical Care Medicine, University of Toronto, in which
Dr. Amaral holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Amaral no
longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: U ESTADUAL PAULISTA-BOTUCATU SAO PAOLO, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 08 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Mar 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2009