THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 03:13:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1982
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.M.R. Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rizk (CPSO#: 90232 ) Dr. S. Ibrahim (CPSO#: 90198 )
Business Address: Jeanne d'Arc Medical Centre
1887 St Joseph Boulevard
Orléans Ontario K1C 7J2
(613) 903-7563

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.M.R. Ibrahim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jun 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rizk (CPSO#: 90232 ) Dr. S. Ibrahim (CPSO#: 90198 )
Business Address: Jeanne d'Arc Medical Centre
1887 St Joseph Boulevard
Orléans Ontario K1C 7J2
(613) 903-7563

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 May 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Nov 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2009
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 May 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 May 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2009