THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:52:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Ann Dr.
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Feb 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 25 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dilworth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Dilworth (CPSO#: 90252 )
Business Address: 1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2B8
(905) 873-0111
Business Address: 150 Eglinton Avenue East
5th Floor
Toronto Ontario M4P 1E8
(416) 481-1601

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Ann Dr.
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 25 Feb 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 25 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dilworth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Dilworth (CPSO#: 90252 )
Business Address: 1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2B8
(905) 873-0111
Business Address: 150 Eglinton Avenue East
5th Floor
Toronto Ontario M4P 1E8
(416) 481-1601

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEIL MICHAEL DILWORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DILWORTH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NEIL MICHAEL DILWORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DILWORTH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College of Dublin, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 May 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 May 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2009