THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:49:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Bengbu Medical College, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, JAPANESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Regional Health
Centre
Department of Hospitalists
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G1G3
Phone: 519-742-3611
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Mar 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Website: www.recordsolution.ca
Date Received: 02 Nov 2017

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maorong Tong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tong (CPSO#: 90274 )
Business Address: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9090
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 742-3611

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, JAPANESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: Bengbu Medical College, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Regional Health
Centre
Department of Hospitalists
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G1G3
Phone: 519-742-3611
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Mar 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.
Tel: 1-888-563-3732
Website: www.recordsolution.ca
Date Received: 02 Nov 2017

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maorong Tong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tong (CPSO#: 90274 )
Business Address: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9090
Business Address: 835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 742-3611

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAORONG TONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAORONG TONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Bengbu Medical College, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 May 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 May 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2009