THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:28:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1001 Queen St W
CAMH
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 14165358501
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sea Shell Medical
112-330 Bronte Street South
Milton
Milton Ontario L9T 7X1
Phone: (905) 693-6733
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1927 Ironoak Way
Oakville Ontario L6H 0N1
Phone: 9056936733
Fax: 9056369388

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Mar 2009
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 17 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tariq Munshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Munshi (CPSO#: 90302 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Address: SeaShell Medical
330 Bronte Street South
Suite 113
Milton Ontario L9T 7X1
(905) 693-6733
Business Address: 1001 Queen St W
CAMH
Psychiatry, Schizophrenia Division
Toronto ON M6J 1H4

Corporation Name: Syed Hashmatullah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Dec 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1001 Queen St W
CAMH
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 14165358501
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sea Shell Medical
112-330 Bronte Street South
Milton
Milton Ontario L9T 7X1
Phone: (905) 693-6733
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1927 Ironoak Way
Oakville Ontario L6H 0N1
Phone: 9056936733
Fax: 9056369388

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 Mar 2009
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 17 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tariq Munshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Munshi (CPSO#: 90302 )
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M 0L8
Business Address: SeaShell Medical
330 Bronte Street South
Suite 113
Milton Ontario L9T 7X1
(905) 693-6733
Business Address: 1001 Queen St W
CAMH
Psychiatry, Schizophrenia Division
Toronto ON M6J 1H4

Corporation Name: Syed Hashmatullah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Dec 2021

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
08 May 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 08 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Tariq Allauddin Munshi may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Tariq Allauddin Munshi may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 May 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 May 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 May 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 08 May 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 2009