THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:21:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Lagos, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, IGBO

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dr. Azuh Medicine Professional Corp
Unit 100
4900 Wyandotte St E
Windsor Ontario N8Y 1H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 974-8682
Fax: (519) 974-8836

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Azuh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Azuh (CPSO#: 90322 )
Business Address: Pillette Village Walk In and
Family Practice Clinic
Unit 100
4900 Wyandotte Street East
Windsor Ontario N8Y 1H7
(519) 974-8682

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, IGBO
Medical School: University of Lagos, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dr. Azuh Medicine Professional Corp
Unit 100
4900 Wyandotte St E
Windsor Ontario N8Y 1H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 974-8682
Fax: (519) 974-8836

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Azuh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Azuh (CPSO#: 90322 )
Business Address: Pillette Village Walk In and
Family Practice Clinic
Unit 100
4900 Wyandotte Street East
Windsor Ontario N8Y 1H7
(519) 974-8682

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
08 Sep 2010
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 08 2010
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Victor Ijoma Azuh may practise medicine independently in family medicine
only, excluding emergency medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Victor Ijoma Azuh may practise medicine independently in family medicine
only, excluding emergency medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Lagos, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Jul 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2010

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2009