THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:17:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MALAY, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 325 Milner Avenue, Suite 410
Toronto Ontario M1B 5N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-4744
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chern Lim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lim (CPSO#: 90329 )
Business Address: 407-2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-4744

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MALAY, MANDARIN
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 325 Milner Avenue, Suite 410
Toronto Ontario M1B 5N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 284-4744
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chern Lim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Aug 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Lim (CPSO#: 90329 )
Business Address: 407-2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto Ontario M1E 4B9
(416) 284-4744

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHERN WENG LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHERN WENG LIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 May 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 May 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Apr 2009