THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:51:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 725 Bronte St S
Milton District Hospital
Emergency Department
Milton ON L9T 9K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-876-7606
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 111 St Andrews Dr
Midland ON L4R 4P4
Phone: 705-526-1300
Extension: 1501
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
Paediatric School Outreach Clinic
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-393-1279
Extension: 20042
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aparna Swaminathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Swaminathan (CPSO#: 90336 )
Business Address: Milton District Hospital
Emergency Department
725 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
(905) 878-2083 Extn: 7038
Business Address: Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
(705) 526-1300 Extn: 1501
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 393-1279 Extn: 20042

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 725 Bronte St S
Milton District Hospital
Emergency Department
Milton ON L9T 9K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-876-7606
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 111 St Andrews Dr
Midland ON L4R 4P4
Phone: 705-526-1300
Extension: 1501
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Health Centre
Paediatric School Outreach Clinic
30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-393-1279
Extension: 20042
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 10 Dec 2008
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 10 2008
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Aparna Swaminathan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Swaminathan (CPSO#: 90336 )
Business Address: Milton District Hospital
Emergency Department
725 Bronte Street South
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
(905) 878-2083 Extn: 7038
Business Address: Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
(705) 526-1300 Extn: 1501
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
Toronto Ontario M6R 1B5
(416) 393-1279 Extn: 20042

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. APARNA SWAMINATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWAMINATHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. APARNA SWAMINATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SWAMINATHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2009
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2009