THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:19:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive, Barrie ON, L4M
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Fax: (705)739-5631

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 04 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 04 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angie Danyluk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Danyluk (CPSO#: 90377 )
Business Address: 201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Business Address: 201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON L4M 6M2

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive, Barrie ON, L4M
Penetanguishene Ontario L9M 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Fax: (705)739-5631

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Forensic Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 04 May 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Forensic Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 04 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angie Danyluk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Jun 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Danyluk (CPSO#: 90377 )
Business Address: 201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON L4M 6M2
Business Address: 201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON L4M 6M2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGIE DANYLUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANYLUK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANGIE DANYLUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANYLUK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 May 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 May 2009