THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/04/25 04:47:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Faculty of Health Sciences, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Gynecologic Oncology
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4378
Fax: (416) 480-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Aug 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Danielle Lyn Vicus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Vicus (CPSO#: 90400 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Gynecologic Oncology
Odette Cancer Centre Suite T2018
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4378

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Faculty of Health Sciences, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Gynecologic Oncology
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4378
Fax: (416) 480-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Aug 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Danielle Lyn Vicus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Vicus (CPSO#: 90400 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Gynecologic Oncology
Odette Cancer Centre Suite T2018
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4378

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Aug 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 01 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Danielle Lyn Vicus may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Obstetrics and Gynecology, Division of Gynecologic Oncology,
University of Toronto, in which Dr. Vicus holds an academic
appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.





VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Danielle Lyn Vicus may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Obstetrics and Gynecology, Division of Gynecologic Oncology,
University of Toronto, in which Dr. Vicus holds an academic
appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.





Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ben-Gurion University of the Negev Faculty of Health Sciences, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Aug 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 17 Oct 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2009