THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:10:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Michoacan Univ of San Nicolas de Hidalgo, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CAMH
GPD and RIC
250 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1R8
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Extension: 34834
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 03 Dec 2009
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Graff Guerrero Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Graff Guerrero (CPSO#: 90401 )
Business Address: CAMH
GMHP and RIC
250 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1R8
(416) 535-8501 Extn: 34834

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: Michoacan Univ of San Nicolas de Hidalgo, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CAMH
GPD and RIC
250 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1R8
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Extension: 34834
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 03 Dec 2009
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Graff Guerrero Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Graff Guerrero (CPSO#: 90401 )
Business Address: CAMH
GMHP and RIC
250 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 1R8
(416) 535-8501 Extn: 34834

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
10 Nov 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 10 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Ariel Graff Guerrero may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Psychiatry, Division of Geriatric Psychiatry, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Graff Guerrero holds
an academic appointment at the rank of Full Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr.Graff
Guerrero no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Ariel Graff Guerrero may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Psychiatry, Division of Geriatric Psychiatry, University of Toronto, in which Dr. Graff Guerrero holds
an academic appointment at the rank of Full Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr.Graff
Guerrero no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Michoacan Univ of San Nicolas de Hidalgo, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 10 Nov 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2009
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2009

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2009

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2009