THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:51:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Universidade Estadual de Campinas, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-25 Wellington Street West
Guelph Internal Medicine Clinic
Guelph Ontario N1H 4H7
Phone: 2262708618
Fax: 5198365199

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marcello Schmidt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Schmidt (CPSO#: 90425 )
Business Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J8

Corporation Name: Dr. Marcello Schmidt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Dec 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Universidade Estadual de Campinas, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 101-25 Wellington Street West
Guelph Internal Medicine Clinic
Guelph Ontario N1H 4H7
Phone: 2262708618
Fax: 5198365199

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
HOSPITAL: Guelph General Hospital
LOCATION: Guelph

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marcello Schmidt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Schmidt (CPSO#: 90425 )
Business Address: 115 Delhi Street
Guelph Ontario N1E 4J8

Corporation Name: Dr. Marcello Schmidt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Dec 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCELLO FREDERICO SANTOS SCHMIDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHMIDT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCELLO FREDERICO SANTOS SCHMIDT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHMIDT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Universidade Estadual de Campinas, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 May 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 May 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 May 2009