THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:04:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Georgian Cardiology Associates
Unit 307
125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 6L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 735-1111
Fax: (705) 735-1888
Address: Royal Victoria Regional Health Ctr
Division of Cardiology
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Extension: 46215
Fax: (705) 739-5698

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 03 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. X. S. Shen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. X. Shen (CPSO#: 90433 )
Business Address: 125 Bell Farm Road
Suite 307
Barrie Ontario L4M 6L2
(705) 735-1111
Business Address: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Division of Cardiology
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9802

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Georgian Cardiology Associates
Unit 307
125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie Ontario L4M 6L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 735-1111
Fax: (705) 735-1888
Address: Royal Victoria Regional Health Ctr
Division of Cardiology
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090
Extension: 46215
Fax: (705) 739-5698

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 03 Oct 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. X. S. Shen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. X. Shen (CPSO#: 90433 )
Business Address: 125 Bell Farm Road
Suite 307
Barrie Ontario L4M 6L2
(705) 735-1111
Business Address: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
Division of Cardiology
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie Ontario L4M 6M2
(705) 728-9802

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XIOU SEEGER SHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. XIOU SEEGER SHEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Jul 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2009