THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:02:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bridgepoint Active Healthcare
Sinai Health System
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto Ontario M4M2B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-8252
Fax: (416) 470-6699

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Baieruss Trinos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Trinos (CPSO#: 90449 )
Business Address: 1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto Ontario M4M 2B5
(416) 461-8252

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Bridgepoint Active Healthcare
Sinai Health System
1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto Ontario M4M2B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 461-8252
Fax: (416) 470-6699

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bridgepoint Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Bridgepoint Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Baieruss Trinos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Trinos (CPSO#: 90449 )
Business Address: 1 Bridgepoint Drive
Toronto Ontario M4M 2B5
(416) 461-8252

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BAIERUSS M TRINOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRINOS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BAIERUSS M TRINOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRINOS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Nevis), 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009