THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:08:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. Luke's College of Medicine - William, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAGALOG

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1B
6941 Derry Road
Milton Ontario L9T 7H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 875-9999
Fax: (905) 875-9940

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maribel Mendoza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mendoza (CPSO#: 90455 )
Business Address: Suite 1B
6941 Derry Road
Milton Ontario L9T 7H5
(905) 875-9999

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAGALOG
Medical School: St. Luke's College of Medicine - William, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 1B
6941 Derry Road
Milton Ontario L9T 7H5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 875-9999
Fax: (905) 875-9940

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maribel Mendoza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mendoza (CPSO#: 90455 )
Business Address: Suite 1B
6941 Derry Road
Milton Ontario L9T 7H5
(905) 875-9999

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIBEL BACANI MENDOZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENDOZA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIBEL BACANI MENDOZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MENDOZA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. Luke's College of Medicine - William, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009