THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:29:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Upper Appleby Professional Centre
23B-1960 Appleby Line
Burlington Ontario L7L 0B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055922280
Fax: 9055922250

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ivan Dzaja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Dzaja (CPSO#: 90460 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Upper Appleby Professional Centre
23B-1960 Appleby Line
Burlington Ontario L7L 0B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055922280
Fax: 9055922250

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ivan Dzaja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Dzaja (CPSO#: 90460 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IVAN DZAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DZAJA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IVAN DZAJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DZAJA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009