THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:55:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 650 Church Street
Toronto Grace Recover Program
3rd Floor
Toronto Ontario M4Y 2G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 925 2251
Extension: 258
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton General Hospital-HHSC
Department of Critical Care
Hamilton Ontario L8L 5A8
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital / CanCOV/Recover Program
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: 416 340 -4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kali Alyssa Barrett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Barrett (CPSO#: 90482 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital - UHN
2-McLaughlin 411-J
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 650 Church Street
Toronto Grace Recover Program
3rd Floor
Toronto Ontario M4Y 2G5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 925 2251
Extension: 258
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton General Hospital-HHSC
Department of Critical Care
Hamilton Ontario L8L 5A8
Phone: 905-521-2100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital / CanCOV/Recover Program
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: 416 340 -4800
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Salvation Army Toronto Grace Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kali Alyssa Barrett Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Mar 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Barrett (CPSO#: 90482 )
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital - UHN
2-McLaughlin 411-J
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(416) 603-5800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KALI ALYSSA BARRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRETT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KALI ALYSSA BARRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARRETT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009