THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:25:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Woodbridge Medical Centre
Unit A13
9600 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 2T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 893-8085
Fax: 905 893 8218
Address: 58-3176 Ridgeway Dr
Mississauga ON L5L 5S6
Phone: (905) 820-3176
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Radhika Dixit Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dixit (CPSO#: 90487 )
Business Address: Woodbridge Medical Centre
A13 - 9600 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 2T1
(905) 893-8085

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Woodbridge Medical Centre
Unit A13
9600 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 2T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 893-8085
Fax: 905 893 8218
Address: 58-3176 Ridgeway Dr
Mississauga ON L5L 5S6
Phone: (905) 820-3176
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 18 Jun 2012
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 18 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Radhika Dixit Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Apr 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dixit (CPSO#: 90487 )
Business Address: Woodbridge Medical Centre
A13 - 9600 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge Ontario L4H 2T1
(905) 893-8085

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RADHIKA DIXIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIXIT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RADHIKA DIXIT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DIXIT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2012
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2012

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2012

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009