THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:19:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sun Yat Sen University of medical Scienc, 1999
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-417-2000
Fax: 905-883-2213
Address: 10 Trench St
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Fax: 905-883-2213

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chengning Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wang (CPSO#: 90490 )
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Pediatrics
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
905-417-2000
Business Address: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: Sun Yat Sen University of medical Scienc, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-417-2000
Fax: 905-883-2213
Address: 10 Trench St
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Richmond Hill ON L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212
Fax: 905-883-2213

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital Vaughan
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
HOSPITAL: Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
LOCATION: Vaughan

HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chengning Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Wang (CPSO#: 90490 )
Business Address: 3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital
Pediatrics
Maple ON L6A 4Z3
905-417-2000
Business Address: Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 4Z3
(905) 883-1212

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHENGNING WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHENGNING WANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WANG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sun Yat Sen University of medical Scienc, 1999

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2013

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009