THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:42:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 629 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 847-4101
Fax: (416) 284-1964
Address: 9 Butternut Lane
Markham Ontario L3P 3M1
Phone: 905-294-0944
Fax: 905-294-4378
Address: 2 Surrey Pl
Toronto ON M5S 2C2
Phone: 416-925-5141
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neil Isaac Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Niel (CPSO#: 90493 ) Dr. N. Isaac (CPSO#: 88362 )
Business Address: Suite 100
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
(416) 494-8800
Business Address: Suite 103
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2K 2W2
(416) 494-8800
Business Address: 555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1N5
(416) 756-6186
Business Address: North York General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6186
Business Address: Suite 206
3292 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2M 4J5
(461) 494-8800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 629 Markham Road
Scarborough Ontario M1H 2A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 847-4101
Fax: (416) 284-1964
Address: 9 Butternut Lane
Markham Ontario L3P 3M1
Phone: 905-294-0944
Fax: 905-294-4378
Address: 2 Surrey Pl
Toronto ON M5S 2C2
Phone: 416-925-5141
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Neil Isaac Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Niel (CPSO#: 90493 ) Dr. N. Isaac (CPSO#: 88362 )
Business Address: Suite 100
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2J 1V1
(416) 494-8800
Business Address: Suite 103
1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M2K 2W2
(416) 494-8800
Business Address: 555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto Ontario M2R 1N5
(416) 756-6186
Business Address: North York General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
(416) 756-6186
Business Address: Suite 206
3292 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2M 4J5
(461) 494-8800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ULLANDA NICOLE NIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ULLANDA NICOLE NIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009