THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:36:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southwest Middlesex Health Centre
22262 Mill Road RR 5
Mount Brydges Ontario N0L 1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 264-2800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Health Services
Western University
Rm 11, UCC
1151 Richmond St.
London Ontario N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-3030
Fax: (519) 661-3380
Address: 1151 Richmond St
Western University, Health Services
2132 Thames Hall
London ON N6A 3K7
Phone: 5196613030
Fax: 5196613380

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. A. Kopechanski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kopechanski (CPSO#: 90503 )
Business Address: Southwest Middlesex Health Centre
22262 Mill Road RR5
Mount Brydges Ontario N0L 1W0
(519) 264-2800
Business Address: 1151 Richmond Street
Room 11, UCC
London Ontario N6A 3K7
(519) 661-3030

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Southwest Middlesex Health Centre
22262 Mill Road RR 5
Mount Brydges Ontario N0L 1W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 264-2800
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Health Services
Western University
Rm 11, UCC
1151 Richmond St.
London Ontario N6A 3K7
Phone: (519) 661-3030
Fax: (519) 661-3380
Address: 1151 Richmond St
Western University, Health Services
2132 Thames Hall
London ON N6A 3K7
Phone: 5196613030
Fax: 5196613380

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
HOSPITAL: Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
LOCATION: Strathroy

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. A. Kopechanski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 May 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kopechanski (CPSO#: 90503 )
Business Address: Southwest Middlesex Health Centre
22262 Mill Road RR5
Mount Brydges Ontario N0L 1W0
(519) 264-2800
Business Address: 1151 Richmond Street
Room 11, UCC
London Ontario N6A 3K7
(519) 661-3030

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAUREN ASTRID KOPECHANSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOPECHANSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAUREN ASTRID KOPECHANSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOPECHANSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009