THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:48:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 444 Douro Street
Upper Level
Stratford Ontario N5A 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-271-7172
Fax: 519-271-5930

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew MacDonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. MacDonald (CPSO#: 90509 )
Business Address: Upper Level
444 Douro Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 0E6
(519) 508-5063

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 444 Douro Street
Upper Level
Stratford Ontario N5A 0E6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-271-7172
Fax: 519-271-5930

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Matthew MacDonald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. MacDonald (CPSO#: 90509 )
Business Address: Upper Level
444 Douro Street
Stratford Ontario N5A 0E6
(519) 508-5063

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW JAMES MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MATTHEW JAMES MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009