THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:54:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jimma University, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AMHARIC, ETHIOPIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Centre
for Healthy Communities
2660 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1K 2S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 640-7391
Fax: (416) 261-1896
Address: TAIBU Community Health Centre
27 Tapscott Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Y7
Phone: (416) 644-3536
Fax: (416) 644-0102

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bedri U. Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ahmed (CPSO#: 90513 )
Business Address: 27 Tapscott Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Y7
(416) 644-3536
Business Address: Scarborough Centre for Healthy Communities
2660 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1K 2S3
(416) 640-7391

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AMHARIC, ETHIOPIAN
Medical School: Jimma University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Scarborough Centre
for Healthy Communities
2660 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1K 2S3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 640-7391
Fax: (416) 261-1896
Address: TAIBU Community Health Centre
27 Tapscott Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Y7
Phone: (416) 644-3536
Fax: (416) 644-0102

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Dec 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 14 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bedri U. Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Apr 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Ahmed (CPSO#: 90513 )
Business Address: 27 Tapscott Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 4Y7
(416) 644-3536
Business Address: Scarborough Centre for Healthy Communities
2660 Eglinton Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1K 2S3
(416) 640-7391

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEDRI USMAEL AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEDRI USMAEL AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jimma University, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 29 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2011

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009