THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 03:37:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 8452571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mariam Youssef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Youssef (CPSO#: 90519 )
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hosp
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 8452571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mariam Youssef Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Feb 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Youssef (CPSO#: 90519 )
Business Address: Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIAM FAYEK GOBRIAL YOUSSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSSEF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARIAM FAYEK GOBRIAL YOUSSEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YOUSSEF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 09 Jul 2015
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 09 Jul 2015
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.

Training

Medical School: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2009

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009