THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:00:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: Mann, Jaskaren Kaur (Used Until: 29 Jun 2011)
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 366 Main Street North
Suite: 201
Brampton Ontario L6V 1P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 455-1455
Fax: (905) 455-5498

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jaskaren K. Dhaliwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dhaliwal (CPSO#: 90521 )
Business Address: 4 - 456 Vodden Street East
Brampton Ontario L6S 5Y7
(905) 497-8155

General Information

Former Name: Mann, Jaskaren Kaur (Used Until: 29 Jun 2011)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 366 Main Street North
Suite: 201
Brampton Ontario L6V 1P8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 455-1455
Fax: (905) 455-5498

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jaskaren K. Dhaliwal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jan 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Dhaliwal (CPSO#: 90521 )
Business Address: 4 - 456 Vodden Street East
Brampton Ontario L6S 5Y7
(905) 497-8155

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASKAREN KAUR DHALIWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHALIWAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JASKAREN KAUR DHALIWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DHALIWAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009