THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:00:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 307-672 Brant St
Burlington ON L7R 2H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-703-1480
Fax: 9053903578
Address: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Phone: 9056323737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 princess Anne Dr
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2B8
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 725 bronte street south
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3001 hospital gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wilfred Tam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Tam (CPSO#: 90538 )
Business Address: 672 Brant Street
Suite 307
Burlington Ontario L7R 2H3
9057031480
Business Address: 55 Avenue Road
Suite 2000
Toronto Ontario M5R 3L2
6479684112

Corporation Name: Wilfred Tam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 307-672 Brant St
Burlington ON L7R 2H3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-703-1480
Fax: 9053903578
Address: 1245 Lakeshore Rd
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Phone: 9056323737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1 princess Anne Dr
Georgetown Ontario L7G 2B8
Phone: (905) 873-0111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 725 bronte street south
Milton Ontario L9T 9K1
Phone: (905) 878-2383
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3001 hospital gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital Milton
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Georgetown Hospital
LOCATION: Georgetown

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hospital
LOCATION: Milton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wilfred Tam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jul 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Tam (CPSO#: 90538 )
Business Address: 672 Brant Street
Suite 307
Burlington Ontario L7R 2H3
9057031480
Business Address: 55 Avenue Road
Suite 2000
Toronto Ontario M5R 3L2
6479684112

Corporation Name: Wilfred Tam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILFRED HERBIE GARCIA TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILFRED HERBIE GARCIA TAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009