THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:38:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC - University Hospital
Department of Medicine
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-2922
Fax: (519) 663-3217
Address: LHSC - Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 663-2922
Fax: (519) 663-3217

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Pharmacology
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Pharmacology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gryn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gryn (CPSO#: 90550 )
Business Address: LHSC-Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 663-2922
Business Address: LHSC-University Hospital
Department of Medicine
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-2922

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC - University Hospital
Department of Medicine
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-2922
Fax: (519) 663-3217
Address: LHSC - Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 663-2922
Fax: (519) 663-3217

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Clinical Pharmacology
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Clinical Pharmacology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gryn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gryn (CPSO#: 90550 )
Business Address: LHSC-Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 663-2922
Business Address: LHSC-University Hospital
Department of Medicine
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
(519) 663-2922

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN ELY GRYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRYN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STEVEN ELY GRYN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRYN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009