THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:48:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 27 Lapsley Road
Toronto Ontario M1B 1K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6478126077
Fax: 4166098686

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vellathottam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Vellathottam (CPSO#: 90562 )
Business Address: 13 Lapsley Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 1K1
(416) 754-9595
Business Address: 27 Lapsley Rd
Scarborough ON M1B 1K1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 27 Lapsley Road
Toronto Ontario M1B 1K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6478126077
Fax: 4166098686

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 24 Jun 2011
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 24 2011
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vellathottam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Vellathottam (CPSO#: 90562 )
Business Address: 13 Lapsley Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 1K1
(416) 754-9595
Business Address: 27 Lapsley Rd
Scarborough ON M1B 1K1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW G VELLATHOTTAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VELLATHOTTAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW G VELLATHOTTAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VELLATHOTTAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 05 Feb 2025
Summary:

This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

 

Re: CAS-XXXXXX-XXX5G6

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program 

 A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person,” or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC.  A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member.  A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.  

 Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.   

 See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 05 Feb 2025
Summary:

This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

 

Re: CAS-XXXXXX-XXX5G6

Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program 

 A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person,” or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC.  A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member.  A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.  

 Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.   

 See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:


Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2011

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2009